EP0155950 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDE POLYMERIC SUPPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1990 [1990/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLECULAR BIOSYSTEMS, INC. 11180 Roselle Street, Suite A San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [1985/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNOLD, Lyle, J., Jr. 5439 Noah Way San Diego, CA 92117 / US | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1985/40] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84903321.2 | 21.08.1984 | [1985/40] | WO1984US01351 | Priority number, date | US19830528856 | 02.09.1983 Original published format: US 528856 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501051 | Date: | 14.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0155950 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155950 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/40] | C07H15/12, C07H17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/40] | Title | German: | OLIGONUKLEOTID-POLYMER-TRAGSYSTEM | [1985/40] | English: | OLIGONUCLEOTIDE POLYMERIC SUPPORT SYSTEM | [1985/40] | French: | SYSTEME DE SUPPORT POLYMERE D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES | [1985/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.1985 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.1985 | Search fee paid | 28.05.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 06.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4358535 (FALKOW STANLEY, et al); | [YP]US4458066 (CARUTHERS MARVIN H [US], et al) | [Y] - EFIMOV et al., Arylsulfonyl Chlorides in the Presence of N-Methylimidazole as Efficient Condensing Reagants in Phosphotriester Oligonucleotide Synthesis, Tetrahedron Letters 23(9), 961-64 (1982 | Examination | - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, Vol. 107 (1974), pages 24-33 |