EP0157802 - DRAFTING SYSTEM FOR YARNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILLIPS, Bobby, Mal Rt. 8, 5741 Chestnut Hills Drive Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 02 /
DUNCAN, Bobby, Dean 115 McCray Drive Abingdon, VA 24210 / US | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | Parent, Yves, et al Kodak-Pathé Département Brevets et Licences Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84903402.0 | 06.09.1984 | [1985/42] | WO1984US01412 | Priority number, date | US19830533040 | 16.09.1983 Original published format: US 533040 | US19840644299 | 27.08.1984 Original published format: US 644299 | [1985/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501304 | Date: | 28.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0157802 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0157802 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D02J1/22 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
D02J1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1985/42] | Title | German: | VERSTRECKSYSTEM FÜR GARNE | [1985/42] | English: | DRAFTING SYSTEM FOR YARNS | [1985/42] | French: | SYSTEME D'ETIRAGE POUR FILS | [1985/42] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.1985 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 28.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH284352 (RIETER JOH JACOB & CIE AG [CH]); | [A]FR1340333 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]US3671623 (FUKUSHIMA TAKAAKI, et al); | [A]US3919748 (BUCHER ERICH) |