EP0159364 - APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING DIGITAL VIDEO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | ||
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURAKAKE, Mitsuo 71-302, Kodan-jutaka 6, Tamadaira 4-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 02 /
MIYASHITA, Hideo 38-23, Asahigaoka 2-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 03 /
OTSUKA, Shoichi 70-302, Kodan-jutaku 6, Tamadaira 4-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84903757.7 | 11.10.1984 | [1985/44] | WO1984JP00479 | Priority number, date | JP19830193738 | 17.10.1983 Original published format: JP 19373883 | [1985/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501816 | Date: | 25.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159364 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.04.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/20, G06F9/26 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
G06T7/0006 (EP,US);
G06V10/20 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30164 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIGITAL-VIDEO-SIGNALEN | [1985/44] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING DIGITAL VIDEO SIGNAL | [1985/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX VIDEO NUMERIQUES | [1985/44] | File destroyed: | 10.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1985 | Translation filed | 04.07.1985 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.1985 | Search fee paid | 04.07.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/44] | 19.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/40] | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3781799 (SCOTT ROBINSON T); | [X]EP0033076 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) | [X] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SEMINAR ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, 19th-20th November 1977, Sart-Tilman, BE, vol. 1, pages 6.1.1. - 6.1.8.; F.A. GERRITSEN et al.: "A fast, multipurpose, microprogrammable image-processor" | [A] - 2IEME CONGRES AFCET-IRIA, RECONNAISSANCE DES FORMES ET INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE, 12th-14th September 1979, Toulouse, FR, pages 249-256; J. BAJON et al.: "Extracteur rapide de caractéristiques d'image vidéo destiné à la robotique" | International search | [Y]JPS5122348 (HITACHI LTD) |