EP0156908 - SHOULDER EXERCISING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRA-GYM ATHLETICS, INC. 2121 Industrial Park P.O.Box 599 Belton TX 76513 / US | [1985/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRENTHAM, Jerry, Don 2121 Industrial Park P.O. Box 599 Belton, TX 76513 / US | [1985/41] | Application number, filing date | 84903833.6 | 01.10.1984 | [1985/41] | WO1984US01582 | Priority number, date | US19830537800 | 30.09.1983 Original published format: US 537800 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501446 | Date: | 11.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0156908 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/00 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
A63B21/4047 (EP);
A63B23/03533 (EP);
A63B23/1245 (EP);
A63B23/1272 (EP);
A63B21/0083 (EP);
A63B21/4033 (EP);
A63B2208/0233 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/41] | Title | German: | ÜBUNGSGERÄT FÜR SCHULTERN | [1985/41] | English: | SHOULDER EXERCISING DEVICE | [1985/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT DES EPAULES | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 02.09.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/16] | 18.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1986/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.07.1985 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 01.07.1985 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 01.07.1985 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 01.07.1985 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 01.07.1985 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 01.07.1985 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 01.07.1985 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 01.07.1985 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 01.07.1985 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.10.1985 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4185818 ; | [Y]US4387893 ; | [Y]US3702188 | [Y] - Athletic Journal, November 180page 3 |