EP0160693 - COMPOSITE MOLDED PLASTIC ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MacLean-Fogg Company 1000 Allanson Road Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/46] | For all designated states MacLEAN-FOGG COMPANY 1000 Allanson Road Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURRAY, Pierre, C. 1361 Mill Creek Drive Buffalo Grove, IL 60090 / US | [1985/46] | Application number, filing date | 84904253.6 | 02.11.1984 | [1985/46] | WO1984US01784 | Priority number, date | US19830549173 | 07.11.1983 Original published format: US 549173 | [1985/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8502237 | Date: | 23.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0160693 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04, F16B39/00 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
B29C37/0082 (EP,US);
B29C33/123 (EP,US);
B29C45/14311 (EP,US);
B29C70/72 (EP,US);
F16B33/006 (EP,US);
Y10S411/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/46] | Title | German: | KOMPOSITGEGOSSENER KUNSTSTOFFGEGENSTAND | [1985/46] | English: | COMPOSITE MOLDED PLASTIC ARTICLE | [1985/46] | French: | ARTICLE EN PLASTIQUE MOULE COMPOSITE | [1985/46] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/19] | 08.11.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1986/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.08.1985 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 07.08.1985 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 07.08.1985 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 07.08.1985 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 07.08.1985 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 07.08.1985 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 07.08.1985 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 07.08.1985 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 07.08.1985 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]AU234145B ; | [Y]US134649 ; | [Y]US1045562 (KENNEDY JOSEPH [US]); | [Y]US2105704 (SHIPPY LEO C, et al); | [Y]US2250580 (GREGORY MARION J); | [Y]US2455664 ; | [Y]DE767903 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [Y]US3187796 (DOUBLE PLUMMER E); | [A]US3348596 (KAJETAN LEITNER); | [Y]GB1147111 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]); | [Y]US3445559 (SITEMAN DAVID C); | [A]GB1274352 (MULTIFASTENER CORP); | [A]US3742995 (CONFER R, et al); | [Y]US3884006 (DIETLEIN ROBERT W); | [A]US4051591 (THOMPSON THOMAS L); | [A]US4059199 (QUANEY PATRICK E); | [A]DE2626178 (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG); | [Y]FR2368630 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) |