EP0162893 - NON-CATALYTIC METHOD FOR REDUCING THE CONCENTRATION OF NITROGEN OXIDE IN COMBUSTION EFFLUENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | ||
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states Exxon Research and Engineering Company, (a Delaware corp.) PO Box 390 Florham Park, New Jersey 07932 / US | ||
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAN, Anthony, M. 67 Country Acres Drive Hampton, NJ 08827 / US | 02 /
DEGREGORIA, Anthony, J. 11 Horseshoe Drive Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | 03 /
HARDY, James, E. 101 Brunswick Avenue Lebanon, NJ 08833 / US | 04 /
LYON, Richard, K. RD 1, 406 Finn Road Pittstown, NJ 08867 / US | 05 /
HURST, Boyd, E. 21 Wehrli Road Long Valley, NJ 07853 / US | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | ||
Former [1985/49] | Field, Roger Norton (GB) Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 84904275.9 | 07.11.1984 | [1985/49] | WO1984US01815 | Priority number, date | US19830550398 | 10.11.1983 Original published format: US 550398 | [1985/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8502130 | Date: | 23.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0162893 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162893 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
B01D53/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/49] | Title | German: | NICHTKATALYTISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES STICKSTOFFOXIDGEHALTES IN VERBRENNUNGSABGASEN | [1985/49] | English: | NON-CATALYTIC METHOD FOR REDUCING THE CONCENTRATION OF NITROGEN OXIDE IN COMBUSTION EFFLUENTS | [1985/49] | French: | PROCEDE NON CATALYTIQUE POUR REDUIRE LA CONCENTRATION D'OXYDE D'AZOTE DANS DES EFFLUENTS DE COMBUSTION | [1985/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1985 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/49] | 25.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.1989 | Request for decision received: 01 | 19.12.1989 | Result of request for decision (01): Request rejected | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.10.1989
Prof. Dr.-Ing. R. Meyer-Pittroff Techn. Universität München Lehrstuhl f. Energiewirtschaft der Lebensmittelindustrie D-85350 Freising-Weihenstephan / DE | 02
18.10.1989
23.11.1989
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.10.1989
Prof. Dr.-Ing. R. Meyer-Pittroff Techn. Universität München Lehrstuhl f. Energiewirtschaft der Lebensmittelindustrie D-85350 Freising-Weihenstephan / DE | ||
02
18.10.1989
23.11.1989
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | |||
Former [1989/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.10.1989
Prof. Dr.-Ing. R. Meyer-Pittroff Techn. Universität München Lehrstuhl f. Energiewirtschaft der Lebensmittelindustrie D-85350 Freising-Weihenstephan / DE | 28.11.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.03.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 03.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.02.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 16.05.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.05.1995 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 01.06.1995 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/43] | Appeal following opposition | 04.12.1991 | Appeal received No. T0925/91 | 04.02.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.04.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2297074 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]); | FR2297074 [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]); | GB1520712 [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [A]GB1520712 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [A]US4335084 (BROGAN THOMAS R); | US4335084 [ ] (BROGAN THOMAS R) | by applicant | US3900554 | FR2297074 | US2297074 |