EP0167547 - LASER CONTROLLED BY A MULTIPLE LAYER HETEROSTRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1986/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEMLA, Daniel, Simon 20 Robin Road Rumson, NJ 07760 / US | 02 /
MILLER, David, Andrew, Barclay 4 Hilltop Circle Lincroft, NJ 07738 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Peter, William 25 Brisbane Hill Drive Colts Neck, NJ 07722 / US | [1986/03] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | ||
Former [1986/03] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 84904309.6 | 19.11.1984 | [1986/03] | WO1984US01890 | Priority number, date | US19830567222 | 30.12.1983 Original published format: US 567222 | [1986/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503171 | Date: | 18.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0167547 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0167547 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/113, H01S3/098, G02F1/015 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP);
G02F1/017 (EP);
H01S3/1061 (EP);
H01S3/113 (EP);
H01S5/065 (EP);
H01S5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/03] | Title | German: | LASER MIT VIELSCHICHT-HETEROSTRUKTURSTEUERUNG | [1988/39] | English: | LASER CONTROLLED BY A MULTIPLE LAYER HETEROSTRUCTURE | [1986/03] | French: | LASER REGULE PAR UNE HETEROSTRUCTURE A COUCHES MULTIPLES | [1986/03] |
Former [1986/03] | LASER UND VIELSCHICHT-HETEROSTRUKTURSTEUERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1985 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 04.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3973216 [ ]; | US3270291 [ ]; | US3462711 [ ] | [Y] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 17, No. 11, April 1975 (New York, US) J.C. McGRODDY: "Bleachable Optical Cell with Variable Recovery Time and Threshold", see pages 3503-3504 | [Y] - Applied Physics Letters, Vol. 43, No. 7, October 1983 (New York, US) W.A. STALLARD et al.: "Bandwidth-Limited Picosecond pulse Generation in a Synchronously Pumped GaAs Laser Containing a Variable Absorber Diode", pages 626-628, see page 626, page 627, left-hand column; figure 1 | [A] - Applied Physics Letters, Vol. 27, No. 10, 15 November 1975 (New York, US) F.K. REINHART et al.: "Integrated Electro-Optic Intercavity Frequency Modulation of Double Heterostructure Injection Laser", pages 532-534, see figure 1 and page 533, right-hand column, paragraph 1 | [XP] - Optics Letters, Vol. 9, No. 11, November 1984 (New York, US) Y. SILVERBERG et al.: "Passive Mode Locking of a Semiconductor Diode Laser", see pages 507-509, in particular page 507 | by applicant | - W.A. STALLARD; D.J. BRADLEY, APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (198310), vol. 43, no. 7, pages 626 - 628 |