EP0165940 - FILTER WITH INTEGRAL STRUCTURAL FRAMEWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street Minneapolis, MN 55431 / US | [1986/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYDEVEN, Robert, M. 3910 N. Valley View Drive Eagen, MN 55121 / US | 02 /
GEHL, Warren 6044 Portland Avenue So. Minneapolis, MN 55417 / US | [1986/01] | Representative(s) | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 S-203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [1986/01] | Ström, Tore Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 S-203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 84904318.7 | 21.11.1984 | [1986/01] | WO1984US01930 | Priority number, date | US19830554828 | 23.11.1983 Original published format: US 554828 | [1986/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8502351 | Date: | 06.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0165940 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0165940 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.06.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/14 | [1986/01] | CPC: |
B01D46/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/01] | Title | German: | FILTER MIT INTEGRALSTRUKTUR | [1986/01] | English: | FILTER WITH INTEGRAL STRUCTURAL FRAMEWORK | [1986/01] | French: | FILTRE AVEC STRUCTURE INTEGRALE | [1986/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1985 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1985 | Search fee paid | 30.09.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/07] | 04.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.08.1985 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   30.09.1985 | 23.08.1985 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   30.09.1985 | 23.08.1985 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   30.09.1985 | 23.08.1985 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   30.09.1985 | 23.08.1985 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   30.09.1985 | 23.08.1985 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   30.09.1985 | 23.08.1985 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   30.09.1985 | 23.08.1985 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   30.09.1985 | 23.08.1985 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   30.09.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.1991 | NL | 09.01.1991 | SE | 09.01.1991 | [1991/49] |
Former [1991/48] | NL | 09.01.1991 | |
SE | 09.01.1991 | ||
Former [1991/35] | SE | 09.01.1991 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4340402 ; | [Y]US3408438 ; | [Y]US2521984 ; | [Y]DE2807546 | Examination | US2147792 | US2591490 |