EP0156099 - Method of and apparatus for data recording [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAYE INSTRUMENTS, INC. 15 De Angelo Drive Bedford, Massachusetts / US | [1985/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldschmidt, Robert E. 11 Pythias Circle Needham Heights Massachusetts / US | 02 /
Ku, Charles C. 9 Carriage Drive Acton Massachusetts / US | 03 /
Townzen, David A. 2 Elm Street Winchesteer Massachusetts / US | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Allsop, John Rowland 10 London End Beaconsfield Buckinghamshire HP9 2JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Allsop, John Rowland European Patent Attorney 10 London End Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 2JH / GB | ||
Former [1985/40] | Allsop, John Rowland Rowland Allsop & Co. Black Boy Yard 15 High Street West Wycombe High Wycombe, Bucks., HP14 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 85100017.4 | 02.05.1980 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | US19790071947 | 04.09.1979 Original published format: US 71947 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0156099 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0156099 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01D1/02 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
G01K7/13 (EP,US);
G01D15/20 (EP,US);
G01D15/30 (EP,US);
G01D18/006 (EP,US);
G01D3/032 (EP,US);
G01D3/0365 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Datenaufzeichnung | [1985/40] | English: | Method of and apparatus for data recording | [1985/40] | French: | Dispositif et méthode d'enregistrement de données | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 02.12.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/24] | 11.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP80301463.8 / EP0024786 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1987 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1285817 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]FR1327170 ; | [A]DE2355361 (BODENSEEWERK PERKIN ELMER CO); | [A]DE2452746 (HANS PETER [DE]); | [A]US3971041 (MASON CHARLES F); | [Y]DE2703014 (WALLNER FRANZ); | [Y]GB2010487 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]GB2012463 (NCR CO) |