blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0152735

EP0152735 - Spender actuated by direct current by way of a capacitive proximity switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.03.1990
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Feldmühle Aktiengesellschaft
Fritz-Vomfelde-Platz 4
D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[1985/35]
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
 [2007/32]
Former [1985/35]01 / * * *
Representative(s)(deleted)
[1986/35]
Former [1985/35]Uhlmann, Hans, Dr. rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem.
Hofstrasse 83
D-41747 Viersen / DE
Application number, filing date85100081.004.01.1985
[1985/35]
Priority number, dateDE1984340057510.01.1984         Original published format: DE 3400575
[1985/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0152735
Date:28.08.1985
Language:DE
[1985/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.07.1985
ClassificationIPC:H03K17/955
[1985/35]
CPC:
H03K17/955 (EP); A47K5/1217 (EP); H03K2017/9606 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/35]
TitleGerman:Durch Gleichspannung mittel eines kapazitiven Näherungsschalters betätigbare Ausgabevorrichtung[1985/35]
English:Spender actuated by direct current by way of a capacitive proximity switch[1985/35]
French:Distributeur s'activant par une tension continue produite par un capteur capacitif[1985/35]
File destroyed:13.06.1996
Examination procedure28.01.1985Examination requested  [1985/35]
08.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/17]
29.11.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1990/17]
Request for further processing for:18.04.1986Request for further processing filed
24.04.1986Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.05.1986Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]CH584981  ;
 [X]US3510677  ;
 [X]DE2538531  ;
 [Y]DE1810653
 [X]  - FUNKSCHAU, Band 52, Nr. 1, Januar 1981, Seiten 97-98, München, DE; H. FEICHTINGER: "Kapazitiver Annäherungs-Schalter"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.