EP0151949 - Loadweighing device for a lift cage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlegel, Urs, Dipl. -Ing. Kapfweid 13 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | 02 /
Tomse, Ljudevit, Dipl. -Ing. Spechtenstrasse CH-6036 Dierikon / CH | 03 /
Wenger, Urs Geissmattstrasse 57 CH-6004 Luzern / CH | [1985/34] | Application number, filing date | 85100413.5 | 16.01.1985 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | CH19840000707 | 14.02.1984 Original published format: CH 70784 | [1985/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0151949 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0151949 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151949 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/34, G01G19/12 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
B66B1/3484 (EP,US);
G01G19/12 (EP,US);
G01G3/1406 (EP,US);
G01L1/225 (EP,US);
G01L5/0061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1985/34] | Title | German: | Lastmesseinrichtung für eine Aufzugskabine | [1985/34] | English: | Loadweighing device for a lift cage | [1985/34] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de charge pour une cabine d'ascenseur | [1985/34] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 12.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB467348 (EXPRESS LIFT CO LTD, et al); | [A]DE1136467 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO); | [A]GB1159524 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]); | [A]US3512595 (LAIMINS ERIC); | [A]GB1281641 (WEIGHWRITE LTD, et al); | [A]US4078623 (OHTA MASATOSHI, et al); | [A]US4223752 (BELCHER CLAUDE A); | [A]EP0030134 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) |