EP0150069 - Method of doping a light guide base material made of quartz glass with germanium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1989 [1989/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Itami Research Laboratories, 1-1, Koya-Kita 1-chome Itami, Hyogo 664 / JP | ||
Former [1985/31] | For all designated states Wacker-Chemitronic Gesellschaft für Elektronik-Grundstoffe mbH Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24 D-84489 Burghausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griesshammer, Rudolf, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Megerleweg 6 D-8262 Altötting / DE | 02 /
Staudigl, Rudolf, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Elisabethstrasse 14 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | 03 /
Herrmann, Hans, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Lindenweg 30 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | [1985/31] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85100576.9 | 22.01.1985 | [1985/31] | Priority number, date | DE19843402318 | 24.01.1984 Original published format: DE 3402318 | [1985/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150069 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150069 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150069 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/012, C03B37/018, C03B37/025 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
C03C13/045 (EP);
C03B37/01413 (EP);
C03B2201/31 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/31] | C03B37/012 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Dotierung von Lichtwellenleitergrundmaterial auf Quarzglasbasis mit Germanium | [1985/31] | English: | Method of doping a light guide base material made of quartz glass with germanium | [1985/31] | French: | Procédé de dopage d'un matériau de base pour guides d'ondes optiques à base d'un verre de quartz avec du germanium | [1985/31] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/31] | 09.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2029400 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al) |