EP0150801 - Rear entry ski boot structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A Via Montebelluna 5/7 31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A Via Montebelluna 5/7 I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sartor, Mariano Via Barile 8 I-31044 Montebelluna(Treviso) / IT | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85100634.6 | 23.01.1985 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | IT19840020636U | 25.01.1984 Original published format: IT 2063684 U | [1985/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0150801 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
A43B5/0427 (EP);
A43B5/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1985/32] | Title | German: | Skischuhstruktur mit Hinteneinstieg | [1985/32] | English: | Rear entry ski boot structure | [1985/32] | French: | Structure de chaussure de ski avec entrée à l'arrière | [1985/32] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 07.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/43] | 09.05.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2354065 ; | [Y]EP0053340 ; | [Y]FR2441353 |