EP0151979 - Guide-track for ball game [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richard Simm & Söhne GmbH & Co. Gablonzerstrasse 2-4 D-7500 Karlsruhe 1 / DE | [1985/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Söhn, Friedrich Steinhofstrasse 17 D-7500 Karlsruhe 41 Wo. / DE | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Lichti, Heiner Lichti - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 85100701.3 | 24.01.1985 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | DE19843402726 | 27.01.1984 Original published format: DE 3402726 | DE19843403182 | 31.01.1984 Original published format: DE 3403182 | [1985/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0151979 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0151979 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151979 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A63F7/36, A63H18/02 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
A63F7/3622 (EP);
A63H18/02 (EP);
A63F2007/0064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/34] | Title | German: | Kugelrollbahn | [1985/34] | English: | Guide-track for ball game | [1985/34] | French: | Piste de guidage pour jeu de bille | [1985/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 15.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE851767 (SICK HELMUT); | [AD]US2000808 (WILLIAMS FREDERICK V); | [A]DE1104876 (VOLLMER WOLFRAM); | [A]GB2078120 (PLAYART LTD); | [A]FR69623E ; | [A]FR2101355 (MATTEL INC) | Examination | US3013726 |