EP0152839 - Electronic cash register [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.1990 [1990/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iida, Yuji 1286-48, Makinogo Shuzenji-cho Tagata-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101045.4 | 01.02.1985 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | JP19840019791 | 06.02.1984 Original published format: JP 1979184 | [1985/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0152839 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152839 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/12, G06F15/22 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
G07G1/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/35] | Title | German: | Elektronische Registrierkasse | [1985/35] | English: | Electronic cash register | [1985/35] | French: | Caisse enregistreuse électronique | [1985/35] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 31.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2840982 [ ]; | DE2758218 [ ]; | DE2651447 [ ] (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD); | GB2067806 [ ] (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | GB2089547 [ ] (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | GB2109972 [ ] (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | GB2058424 [ ] (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | DE3123909 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]) |