EP0154171 - Magnetic sensor module for a ground fault circuit interrupter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1985/37] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morris, Robert Allan 56 Nassahegan Drive Burlington Connecticut 06013 / US | 02 /
Kiesel, George William 43 Savarese Lane Burlington Connecticut 06013 / US | 03 /
Krajewski, Alexander Anthony 97 West Main Street Terryville Connecticut 06786 / US | 04 /
Rajotte, Paul Thomas 70 Forestville Avenue Plainville Connecticut 06062 / US | [1985/37] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101121.3 | 04.02.1985 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | US19840579337 | 13.02.1984 Original published format: US 579337 | [1985/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0154171 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/12, H01H83/14 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
H01H83/144 (EP);
H01F38/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/37] | Title | German: | Baueinheit für magnetischen Sensor für einen Fehlerstromschutzschalter | [1985/37] | English: | Magnetic sensor module for a ground fault circuit interrupter | [1985/37] | French: | Assemblage de détecteur magnétique pour un déclencheur par courant de défaut | [1985/37] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 05.03.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3950677 ; | [Y]DE1285609 ; | [A]DE1115819 ; | [A]DE8011197U |