EP0151479 - Control assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.1990 [1990/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/33] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritz, Harald, Dipl.-Ing. Hebelstrasse 5 D-7517 Waldbronn 3 / DE | 02 /
Wurll, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Kärcherstrasse 60 D-7500 Karlsruhe / DE | [1985/33] | Application number, filing date | 85101152.8 | 04.02.1985 | [1985/33] | Priority number, date | DE19843404047 | 06.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3404047 | [1985/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0151479 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0151479 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151479 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06K11/06 | [1985/33] | CPC: |
G05G9/047 (EP);
C21D3/04 (EP);
C21D8/0426 (EP);
C21D8/0457 (EP);
C21D8/0473 (EP);
G05G2009/04722 (EP);
G05G2009/04762 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/33] | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung | [1985/33] | English: | Control assembly | [1985/33] | French: | Dispositif de commande | [1985/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/18] | 10.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58172739 ; | [A]FR2312070 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]); | [A]DE2030048 (ASKANIA GMBH); | [A]US3628394 (KEATINGE GERALD R, et al); | [A]US3447766 (PALFREYMAN RAYMOND D) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 14 (P-249)[1451], 21. Januar 1984; & JP-A-58 172 739 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 11.10.1983, & JP58172739 A 00000000 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 13, Nr. 2, Juli 1970, Seiten 578-579, New York, US; C.J. EVANGELISTI u.a.: "Manipulator" |