EP0159474 - Inking arrangement for offset printing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1989 [1989/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 29 40 69019 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeschke, Willi Berghalde 68 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101334.2 | 19.10.1982 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | DE19813143314 | 31.10.1981 Original published format: DE 3143314 | DE19823232780 | 03.09.1982 Original published format: DE 3232780 | [1985/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159474 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159474 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B41F7/06, B41F31/00, B41F7/24 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
B41F7/06 (EP,US);
B41F31/00 (EP,US);
B41F7/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/44] | Title | German: | Farbwerk für Offsetdruckmaschinen | [1985/44] | English: | Inking arrangement for offset printing machines | [1985/44] | French: | Dispositif d'encrage pour machines d'impression offset | [1985/44] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/44] | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP82109626.0 / EP0078444 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 08.02.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.1985 | 31.10.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3709147 (GRANGER W); | [Y]US4041864 (DAHLGREN HAROLD P, et al); | [A]BE857275 (ADDRESSOGRAPH MULTIGRAPH); | [A]GB2040228 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH); | [E]DE3134796 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0064270 |