EP0152080 - Light source device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mori, Kei 3-16-3-501, Kaminoge Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | For all designated states Mori, Kei 3-16-3-501, Kaminoge Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101365.6 | 08.02.1985 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | JP19840023594 | 10.02.1984 Original published format: JP 2359484 | [1985/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0152080 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0152080 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A01G7/00, F21S5/00 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
G03F7/70216 (EP,US);
G02B6/0008 (EP,KR,US);
A01G7/045 (KR,US);
A01G9/249 (EP);
Y02P60/14 (US);
Y10S362/805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/34] | Title | German: | Lichtquelle | [1985/34] | English: | Light source device | [1985/34] | French: | Source de lumière | [1985/34] | File destroyed: | 13.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 22.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 20.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3040993 (SCHULTZ EDWARD J); | [A]DE2016498 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4160285 (SHIBLA JAMES N) |