EP0154831 - Rod-shaped polymer latex, rod-shaped polymer fine power and dispersion comprising the fine powder dispersed in non-aqueous medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1992 | Correction of patent specification | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsujii, Kaoru 1022,88, Himuro-cho Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | 02 /
Yoshimatsu, Akira 4254-14, Hiraide-cho Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | [1985/38] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101638.6 | 14.02.1985 | [1985/38] | Priority number, date | JP19840036380 | 28.02.1984 Original published format: JP 3638084 | JP19840117511 | 08.06.1984 Original published format: JP 11751184 | [1985/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0154831 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0154831 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154831 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0154831 | Date: | 22.09.1992 | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/24, C08G85/00, C08J3/16, C08J3/11, A61K7/00 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
A61K8/0291 (EP,US);
A61K8/8117 (EP,US);
A61Q1/08 (EP,US);
C08F2/24 (EP,US);
C08G18/0866 (EP,US);
C08J3/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1985/38] | C08F2/24, C08G85/00, C08J3/16, C08J3/08, A61K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1985/38] | Title | German: | Faserförmiger Polymerlatex, faserförmiges feinverteiltes Polymerpulver und das feinverteilte Pulver in nichtwässrigem Medium enthaltende Dispersionen | [1985/38] | English: | Rod-shaped polymer latex, rod-shaped polymer fine power and dispersion comprising the fine powder dispersed in non-aqueous medium | [1985/38] | French: | Latex polymère de forme fibreuse, poudre polymère finement divisée de forme fibreuse et dispersions en milieu non aqueux de la poudre finement divisée | [1985/38] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/21] | 09.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3431242 (WATERS PAUL F, et al); | [A]FR2132903 (CROWN ZELLERBACH CORP); | [A]EP0008809 (DULUX AUSTRALIA LTD [AU]) | by applicant | JPS5555414 | - COLLECTION OF POLYMER THESES, (1979), vol. 36 | - KAGAKU GIKEN REPORT, (1980), vol. 35 |