EP0153670 - Apparatus and Method for expanding a conduit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/36] | Hybrid Expansion apparatus and process | ||
[1989/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1990 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.1990 [1990/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/36] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zafred, Paolo Rodolfo 1112 Palo Alto Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15212 / US | [1985/36] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Holzer, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) W. Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/36] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Holzer Dipl.-Ing. (FH) W. Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101649.3 | 15.02.1985 | [1985/36] | Priority number, date | US19840584225 | 27.02.1984 Original published format: US 584225 | [1985/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0153670 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0153670 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0153670 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/06, B21D39/10, B21D39/20 | [1985/36] | CPC: |
B21D39/06 (EP,US);
B21D41/02 (KR);
B21D39/10 (EP,US);
B21D39/20 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49805 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4994 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53122 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Aufweiten von Rohren | [1989/17] | English: | Apparatus and Method for expanding a conduit | [1989/17] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'expansion d'un tube | [1989/17] |
Former [1985/36] | Kombiniertes Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Expandieren | ||
Former [1985/36] | Hybrid Expansion apparatus and process | ||
Former [1985/36] | Procédé et appareil d'expansion combiné | Examination procedure | 20.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/51] | 09.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1143758 (PERFECTIONNEMENT DU MATERIEL D); | [X]FR2292534 (BALCKE DUERR AG [DE]); | [X]US3979810 (KRIPS HERBERT, et al); | [A]FR2345243 (COMBUSTION ENG [US]); | [A]US4178787 (GERKEY KENNETH S [US]); | [A]US4196609 (MORI EITSUGU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0055101 (HASKEL INC [US]) | Examination | US4210991 |