EP0156155 - Aqueous dispersions of graft polymers or graft copolymers, their preparation process and their use as water and oil repellent compositions for textile materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.1988 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.1988 [1988/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
König, Joachim, Dr. Auf dem Broich 25 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
Süling, Carlhans, Dr. Carl-Leverkus-Strasse 10 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
Nachtkamp, Klaus, Dr. Leuchterstrasse 112 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [1985/40] | Application number, filing date | 85101728.5 | 16.02.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | DE19843407362 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3407362 | [1985/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0156155 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156155 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/576, C08F283/00, // (C08F283/00, 220:24) | [1985/40] | CPC: |
D06M15/576 (EP,US);
C08F283/006 (EP,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/6659 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F283/006, C08F220/24 (EP,US);
C08G18/12, C08G18/3231 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/40] | Title | German: | Wässrige Dispersionen von Pfropfpolymerisaten oder -copolymerisaten, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Hydrophobierungs- und Oleophobierungsmittel für Textilien | [1985/40] | English: | Aqueous dispersions of graft polymers or graft copolymers, their preparation process and their use as water and oil repellent compositions for textile materials | [1985/40] | French: | Dispersions aqueuses de polymères greffés ou de copolymères greffés, leur procédé de préparation et leur emploi comme agents hydrophobes et oléophobes pour les matières textiles | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 09.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3068187 (BOLSTAD ARCHIBALD N, et al) |