EP0157141 - Device for fast profile plotting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.04.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROGE - Groupement d'Intérêt Economique régi par l'Ordonnance du 27 septembre 1967 3-5 Villa Ségur 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states PROGE - Groupement d'Intérêt Economique régi par l'Ordonnance du 27 septembre 1967 3-5 Villa Ségur F-75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denimal, Philippe Les Martres d'Artières F-63430 Pont du Chateau / FR | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Renaudie, Jacques FROGE 3-5 Villa Ségur 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Renaudie, Jacques FROGE 3-5 Villa Ségur F-75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85101761.6 | 18.02.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | FR19840002927 | 23.02.1984 Original published format: FR 8402927 | [1985/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0157141 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/335, G01B11/02 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
G01B11/024 (EP,US);
H04N25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/41] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum schnellen Profilaufzeichnen | [1985/41] | English: | Device for fast profile plotting | [1985/41] | French: | Dispositif de relevé de profil rapide | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 10.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 26.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/41] | 09.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1988/24] | 31.01.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4322752 (BIXBY JAMES A) |