EP0153692 - Method for isomerization a glycidate derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/36] | Catalyst and method for isomerization | ||
[1992/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGAMI CHEMICAL RESEARCH CENTER 11-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1992/19] |
Former [1985/36] | For all designated states SAGAMI CHEMICAL RESEARCH CENTER 4-5, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirai, Kenji 1-9-2, Minamidai Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Fuchikami, Takamasa 1-9-2, Minamidai Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Hirose, Hiroaki 2-17, Tatsumidai-Higashi Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Ojima, Iwao 6 Ivy League Lane Stony Brook New York 11790 / US | [1985/36] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/36] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101842.4 | 20.02.1985 | [1985/36] | Priority number, date | JP19840032513 | 24.02.1984 Original published format: JP 3251384 | JP19840157594 | 30.07.1984 Original published format: JP 15759484 | JP19840198717 | 25.09.1984 Original published format: JP 19871784 | [1985/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0153692 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0153692 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0153692 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/16, C07C69/732, C07C69/738, C07C67/30 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
B01J31/2291 (EP,US);
B01J31/16 (EP,US);
B01J31/2295 (EP,US);
C07C41/56 (EP,US);
C07C45/58 (EP,US);
C07C67/333 (EP,US);
B01J2231/52 (EP,US);
B01J2531/822 (EP,US);
B01J2531/824 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C41/56, C07C43/303 (EP,US);
C07C45/58, C07C47/228 (EP,US);
C07C45/58, C07C47/23 (US,EP);
C07C45/58, C07C47/24 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1985/36] | B01J31/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/36] | Title | German: | Methode zum Isomerisieren eines Glycidats | [1992/31] | English: | Method for isomerization a glycidate derivative | [1992/31] | French: | Métode pour l'isomérisation d'un glycidate | [1992/31] |
Former [1985/36] | Katalysator und Methode zum Isomerisieren | ||
Former [1985/36] | Catalyst and method for isomerization | ||
Former [1985/36] | Catalyseur et méthode d'isomérisation | Examination procedure | 12.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 20.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.1992 | BE | 29.07.1992 | CH | 29.07.1992 | IT | 29.07.1992 | LI | 29.07.1992 | NL | 29.07.1992 | SE | 29.07.1992 | FR | 18.12.1992 | LU | 28.02.1993 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 29.07.1992 | ||
CH | 29.07.1992 | ||
IT | 29.07.1992 | ||
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
NL | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
FR | 18.12.1992 | ||
LU | 28.02.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 29.07.1992 | ||
CH | 29.07.1992 | ||
IT | 29.07.1992 | ||
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
NL | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
FR | 18.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | AT | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 29.07.1992 | ||
CH | 29.07.1992 | ||
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
NL | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
FR | 18.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | AT | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 29.07.1992 | ||
CH | 29.07.1992 | ||
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
NL | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 29.07.1992 | |
CH | 29.07.1992 | ||
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
NL | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/11] | CH | 29.07.1992 | |
LI | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/10] | CH | 29.07.1992 | |
LI | 29.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2434244 [ ] (NISSHIN FLOUR MILLING CO); | US4016196 [ ] (KOGURE KATSURA, et al); | GB2052293 [ ] (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP) | Examination | EP0118801 |