EP0153696 - Process for preparing 5,6,7,8-tetrahydro-6-(l-erythro-1',2'-dihydroxypropyl) pterin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/36] | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Azuma, Masaaki 6-6-520, Maikodai Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohashi, Takehisa 9-14, Obanoyamacho 3-chome Shinohara Nada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Kiyoshi 15-41, Matsugaoka 5-chome Akashi-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1985/36] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1985/36] | Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat. Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101861.4 | 21.02.1985 | [1985/36] | Priority number, date | JP19840033839 | 23.02.1984 Original published format: JP 3383984 | [1985/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0153696 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0153696 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0153696 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D475/04 | [1985/36] | CPC: |
C07D475/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 5,6,7,8-Tetrahydro-6-(L-erythro-1'-2'-dihydroxypropyl)pterin | [1985/36] | English: | Process for preparing 5,6,7,8-tetrahydro-6-(l-erythro-1',2'-dihydroxypropyl) pterin | [1985/36] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de 5,6,7,8-tétrahydro-6-(L-érythro-1'-2'-dihydroxypropyl)ptérine | [1985/36] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 21.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.1990
20.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE Suntory Limited/ Shiratori Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-40, Dojimahama, 2-chome/ 11-24, 6-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi/ Tsudanuma, Narashino-shi / JP Opponent's representative Lehn, Werner Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.1990
20.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE Suntory Limited/ Shiratori Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-40, Dojimahama, 2-chome/ 11-24, 6-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi/ Tsudanuma, Narashino-shi / JP Opponent's representative Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.1990
Suntory Limited/ Shiratori Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-40, Dojimahama, 2-chome/ 11-24, 6-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi/ Tsudanuma, Narashino-shi / JP Opponent's representative Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | 22.08.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.02.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.03.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M05) | 13.08.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.10.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.01.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.01.1993 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.01.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1997/17] | Appeal following opposition | 26.03.1993 | Appeal received No. T0311/93 | 01.06.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.01.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 16.01.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.01.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0079574 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) | [AD] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, vol. 61, fascicule 7, no. 257, 1978, pages 2731-2738, Basel, CH; B. SCHIRCKS et al.: "Über Pterinchemie. 65. Mitteilung. Herstellung von (6R,S)-5,6,7,8-Tetrahydro-L-biopterin, 7,8-Dihydro-L-biopterin, L-Sepiapterin, Deoxysepiapterin, (6R,S)-5,6-Dihydrodeoxysepiapterin und 2'-Deoxybiopterin" | [AD] - TANPAKUSHITSU KAKUSAN KOSO, vol. 26, no. 9, 1981, pages 1394-1398; S. MATSUURA "Chemical preparation of a natural-type cofactor for monooxygenases related to monoamine biosynthesis" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 25, 20th December 1982, page 896, column 1, abstract no. 216602y, Columbus, Ohio, US; W.L.F. ARMAREGO et al.: "Pterins. VIII. The absolute configuration at C-6 of natural 2-amino-6-[(1R,2S)-1,2-dihydroxypropyl]-5,6,7,8-tetrahydropteridin-4(3H)-one (L-erythro-5,6,7,8-tetrahydrobiopterin)", & AUST. J. CHEM. 1982, 35(4), 785-793 |