EP0158066 - Photoelectric pulse generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmann Kienzle GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 45 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states Mannesmann Kienzle GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 45 D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states Kienzle Apparate GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse D-7730 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daiger, Robert Warenburgstrasse 31 D-7730 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 02 /
Hoeren, Kurt Bad Dürrheimer Strasse 19 D-7734 Brigachtal / DE | 03 /
Hummel, Dietmar Röntgen-Strasse 45 D-7730 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [1985/42] | Application number, filing date | 85101973.7 | 22.02.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | DE19843407590 | 01.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3407590 | [1985/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0158066 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/486 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
G01P3/486 (EP,US);
H03M1/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1985/42] | Title | German: | Fotoelektrischer Impulsgeber | [1985/42] | English: | Photoelectric pulse generator | [1985/42] | French: | Générateur d'impulsion photoélectrique | [1985/42] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 17.06.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/51] | 16.07.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3104500 (HUEBNER ELEKTROMASCH AG [DE]); | [A]DE3014821 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]); | [A]DE2404081 (LESTER WALDEMAR); | [A]EP0003288 (ELECTRO CRAFT CORP [US]); | [A]US3746988 (FORD E, et al); | [AD]US3436655 (LUNDGREEN MICHAEL W); | [AD]DE2726242 (KIENZLE APPARATE GMBH) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 18, Nr. 12, Mai 1976, Seiten 3943-3944, New YorkUS; W.E. BROOM et al.: "Tachometer with phase adjustment features" |