EP0155552 - Process for making material containing inserts sensitive to shear forces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/39] | Reinforced composite | ||
[1990/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/39] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bier, Peter, Dr. Bodelschwinghstrasse 18 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Löhr, Karl-Dieter, Dr. Zum Wald 25 D-4234 Alphen / DE | 03 /
Titze, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Schützenstrasse 9 D-7971 Aitrach / DE | [1985/39] | Application number, filing date | 85102129.5 | 27.02.1985 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | DE19843408224 | 07.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3408224 | [1985/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155552 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155552 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155552 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/12, B29C47/00 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
B29C70/12 (EP,US);
B29B11/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/52 (EP,US);
B29C48/625 (EP,US);
B29C48/766 (EP,US);
B29C70/025 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29K2105/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Werkstoffen mit gegen Scherkräfte empfindlichen Einlagen | [1990/33] | English: | Process for making material containing inserts sensitive to shear forces | [1990/33] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de matériau comprenant des éléments sensibles aux efforts de cisaillement | [1990/33] |
Former [1985/39] | Verstärkter Werkstoff | ||
Former [1985/39] | Reinforced composite | ||
Former [1985/39] | Matière composite renforcée | Examination procedure | 27.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/39] | 25.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB791567 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG); | [A]GB824449 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]US3316139 (ALFORD HARVEY E, et al); | [A]LU58086 ; | [A]DE2262752 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]US3788937 (LEE G); | [Y]US4009043 (PREIS LOTHAR); | [AD]US4015039 (SEGAL LEON, et al); | [YD]US4044188 (SEGAL LEON); | [X]EP0056702 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [T]EP0150931 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [Y]US4646618 (KURTH JOSEF [DE], et al) |