EP0154342 - Method for producing highly pure glass preform for optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Gotaro c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. No.1, Taya-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kanamori, Hiroo c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. No.1, Taya-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Mizutani, Futoshi c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. No.1, Taya-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1985/37] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/37] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102580.9 | 07.03.1985 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | JP19840043640 | 07.03.1984 Original published format: JP 4364084 | [1985/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0154342 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0154342 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154342 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/018 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
C03B37/0142 (EP,US);
C03B37/12 (KR);
C03B37/01446 (EP,US);
C03B2207/06 (EP,US);
C03B2207/20 (EP,US);
C03B2207/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer hochreinen Glasvorform für optische Faser | [1985/37] | English: | Method for producing highly pure glass preform for optical fiber | [1985/37] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une préforme en verre d'une haute pureté pour des fibres optiques | [1985/37] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0018704 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | [X]US4294601 (DABBY FRANKLIN W, et al); | [X]EP0041397 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | [X]US4363647 (BACHMAN DAVID L, et al) |