EP0177666 - Ink metering roller for lithographic printing and process for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/16] | Ink metering roller for lithographic printing | ||
[1989/23] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.1993 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 24.03.1993 [1993/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15219 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states Rockwell International Corporation 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fadner, Thomas Alan 1084 64th Street LaGrange Illinois 60525 / US | 02 /
Hycner, Stanley Henry 244 Ewell Court Bartlett Illinois 60103 / US | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/47] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-8000 München 60 / DE | ||
Former [1986/16] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-8000 München 60 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102583.3 | 07.03.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | US19840649773 | 12.09.1984 Original published format: US 649773 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177666 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177666 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177666 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/26, B41F7/36 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
B41N7/06 (EP,US);
B41N2207/02 (EP,US);
B41N2207/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Farbdosierwalze für lithografisches Drucken und Herstellungsprozess hierfür | [1989/23] | English: | Ink metering roller for lithographic printing and process for producing same | [1989/23] | French: | Rouleau-doseur d'encrage pour imprimerie lithographique et procédé de fabrication de celui-ci | [1989/23] |
Former [1986/16] | Farbdosierwalze für lithografisches Drucken | ||
Former [1986/16] | Ink metering roller for lithographic printing | ||
Former [1986/16] | Rouleau-doseur d'encrage pour imprimerie lithographique | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 09.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.1990
20.03.1990
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.1990
20.03.1990
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | 10.04.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.09.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 03.11.1992 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.03.1990 | SE | 08.03.1990 | CH | 31.03.1990 | LI | 31.03.1990 | FR | 30.11.1990 | DE | 01.12.1990 | [1991/49] |
Former [1991/32] | GB | 07.03.1990 | |
SE | 08.03.1990 | ||
CH | 31.03.1990 | ||
LI | 31.03.1990 | ||
DE | 01.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/30] | GB | 07.03.1990 | |
SE | 08.03.1990 | ||
DE | 01.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 08.03.1990 | |
DE | 01.12.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | SE | 08.03.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | JP5856855 [ ]; | US3924313 [ ] (BRODERICK FRANK WILLIAM); | US4407196 [ ] (MATALIA HARSHAD D [US], et al) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, Section M. vol. 7, no. 145, June 24, 1983, THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 74 M 224 & JP-A-58-56 855 (toukiyou kikai seisakusho), & JP5856855 A 00000000 | Opposition | DE2934113 | JPS5856855 | US3924313 |