EP0155601 - Four-angled container for holding four-angled disc, audio tape or video tape cassettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rudolf Wittner GmbH u. Co. Bühlbergstrasse 5-6 D-88316 Isny / DE | [1985/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Härle, Fritz D-7972 Isny-Neutrauchburg / DE | [1985/39] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/39] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102585.8 | 07.03.1985 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | DE19843410480 | 22.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3410480 | [1985/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155601 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155601 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/04, G11B23/02 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
G11B23/02 (EP);
G11B33/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, LI, NL [1985/39] | Title | German: | Quaderförmiger Behälter zum Aufbewahren quaderförmiger Schallplatten-, Tonband- oder Videobandkassetten | [1985/39] | English: | Four-angled container for holding four-angled disc, audio tape or video tape cassettes | [1985/39] | French: | Réceptacle quadrangulaire pour emmagasiner des cassettes quadrangulaires pour disques, bandes audio ou bandes vidéo | [1985/39] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 09.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 20.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2133388 (MEE SUN MANUFACTURING CO LTD); | [A]US3736036 (MATHUS G); | [A]US4201298 (LARSON DONALD A [US], et al); | [A]CH558583 (SEILIB); | [A]AU492386B ; | [A]FR2345783 (KARSENTY ROLAND [FR]); | [A]US3999818 (SCHANKLER MARTIN M); | [A]US3856369 (COMMIANT MICHEL [BE]); | [A]FR2506492 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]US3963287 (RUMBLE RICHARD ROY) |