EP0163819 - Polyolefin compounds having improved thermal stability and conductors coated therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.1992 [1992/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vulkor, Incorporated 950 Broadway Lowell, Massachusetts 01854 / US | [1988/38] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Betts, Joseph Elwood 44 Park Lane Westport, CT 06880 / US | 02 /
Fridland, Ida 35 Christine Drive Huntington, CT 06611 / US | 03 /
Wilkus, Edward Vincent 44 Park Lane Westport, CT 06880 / US | [1991/06] |
Former [1985/50] | 01 /
Betts, Joseph Elwood 44 Park Lane Westport, Connecticut 06880 / US | ||
02 /
Fridland, Ida 35 Christine Drive Huntington Connecticut 06611 / US | |||
03 /
Wilkus, Edward Vincent 44 Park Lane Westport Connecticut 06880 / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/02] | Sieb, Rolf, Dr. Finstertal 12 D-69514 Laudenbach / DE | ||
Former [1985/50] | Sieb, Rolf, Dr. General Electric - Deutschland Patentabteilung Praunheimer Landstrasse 50 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102724.3 | 09.03.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | US19840590603 | 19.03.1984 Original published format: US 590603 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163819 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0163819 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163819 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/44, H01B3/30, C08K5/00, C08K3/00 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
C08K13/02 (EP);
C08K5/098 (EP);
H01B3/301 (EP);
H01B3/305 (EP);
H01B3/421 (EP);
H01B3/426 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/50] | Title | German: | Polyolefinzusammensetzungen mit thermischer Stabilität und damit überzogene Leiter | [1991/06] | English: | Polyolefin compounds having improved thermal stability and conductors coated therewith | [1985/50] | French: | Compositions de polyoléfines avec une stabilité thermique et conducteurs revêtus de ces compositions | [1985/50] |
Former [1985/50] | Polyolefinzusammensetzungen mit thermischer Stabilität und überzogenem Leiter | Examination procedure | 23.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 19.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP54106555 ; | [X]US4247446 ; | [X]US3860676 ; | [X]FR2346398 ; | [X]US4373048 ; | [X]FR2398372 ; | [X]FR2398373 ; | [X]AU522219 ; | [X]WO8300488 ; | [X]BE897157 ; | [X]EP0045957 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 8, page 37, ref.nr. 59726u; Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-54 106 555 (HITACHI CABLE, Ltd.) 21-08-1979, & JP54106555 A 00000000 |