EP0162211 - Stable dental impression material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1990 [1990/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/48] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwabe, Peter, Dr. Dudweiler Strasse 17 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Schlak, Ottfried, Dr. Carl-Duisberg-Strasse 331 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Knispel, Gottfried, Dr. Richard-Wagner-Strasse 3 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 04 /
Voigt, Reiner Gustav-Radbruch-Strasse 14 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1985/48] | Application number, filing date | 85102801.9 | 12.03.1985 | [1985/48] | Priority number, date | DE19843410646 | 23.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3410646 | [1985/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0162211 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162211 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/10, C08L83/07 | [1985/48] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
A61K6/90 (EP,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/48] | Title | German: | Dimensionsstabile Abformmassen | [1985/48] | English: | Stable dental impression material | [1985/48] | French: | Compositions pour empreintes dentaires stables | [1985/48] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/48] | 03.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2709161 (KILBOURNE JR FREDERICK L, et al); | [Y]FR2400052 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE2926405 (G C DENTAL IND CORP); | [Y]US4356116 (BEERS MELVIN D); | [Y]US4430461 (DEERING DANA F [US], et al) |