EP0178371 - Appliance for the dosed subcutanous and intravenous infusion of drugs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intermedicat GmbH Gerliswilstrasse 74 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | For all designated states INTERMEDICAT GMBH Gerliswilstrasse 74 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köhler, Uwe, Dipl.-Phys Elisabethweg 12 D-3588 Homberg / DE | 02 /
Stöber, Herbert Über dem Rötter 1 D-3513 Staufenberg 1 / DE | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1986/17] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102858.9 | 13.03.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | DE19843420893 | 05.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3420893 | [1986/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178371 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/17] | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
A61M5/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/17] | Title | German: | Dosiervorrichtung für die subkutane und intravenöse Zuführung flüssiger Arzneimittel | [1986/17] | English: | Appliance for the dosed subcutanous and intravenous infusion of drugs | [1986/17] | French: | Dispositif de dosage destiné à l'administration subcutanée et intraveineuse de médicaments | [1986/17] | File destroyed: | 16.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 31.05.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |