EP0157248 - Method for driving a gas discharge panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinoda, Tsutae 11-10, Takaoka 3-chome Okubocho Akashi-shi Hyogo. 674 / JP | 02 /
Niinuma, Atuo 12-10, Tanogami Suzaka-shi Nagano. 382 / JP | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Seeger, Wolfgang Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Seeger, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys. SEEGER & SEEGER Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102931.4 | 14.03.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | JP19840053189 | 19.03.1984 Original published format: JP 5318984 | JP19840077421 | 16.04.1984 Original published format: JP 7742184 | JP19840267856 | 18.12.1984 Original published format: JP 26785684 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157248 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157248 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0157248 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
G09G3/2927 (EP,US);
G09G3/2935 (EP,US);
G09G3/294 (EP,US);
G09G3/298 (EP,US);
G09G3/2983 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0216 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Gasentladungsanzeigevorrichtung | [1985/41] | English: | Method for driving a gas discharge panel | [1985/41] | French: | Méthode de commande d'un panneau d'affichage à décharge à gaz | [1985/41] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 17.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0113873 (BURROUGHS CORP [US]); | [A]US4373157 (HOLZ GEORGE E, et al); | [A]US3886389 (OGLE JAMES A); | [A]US3851210 (SCHERMERHORN J); | [A]US4011558 (SHARPLESS GRAHAM TREVOR); | [A]EP0003157 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al) |