EP0160193 - Apparatus for gas dispersion in liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.1989 [1989/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider, Norbert Holbeinstrasse 13 42781 Haan / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | For all designated states Schneider, Norbert Holbeinstrasse 13 D-42781 Haan / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/45] | Representative(s) | König, Reimar, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | König, Reimar, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Reimar König Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Bergen Wilhelm-Tell-Strasse 14 Postfach 260254 D-40095 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102945.4 | 14.03.1985 | [1985/45] | Priority number, date | DE19843410267 | 21.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3410267 | [1985/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0160193 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0160193 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/20 | [1985/45] | CPC: |
C02F3/201 (EP,US);
B01F23/23124 (EP,US);
B01F23/231262 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US);
Y10T137/789 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, IT, NL [1985/45] | Title | German: | Begasungsgerät | [1985/45] | English: | Apparatus for gas dispersion in liquids | [1985/45] | French: | Appareil pour la dispersion de gaz dans des liquides | [1985/45] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/22] | 16.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1254600 (EIMCO CORP); | [A]EP0028728 (MESSNER RUDOLF) |