EP0155700 - Apparatus for quantitative secondary ion mass spectrometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/39] | Apparatus for quantitive secondary ion mass spectrometry | ||
[1990/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1990 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/48] |
Former [1985/39] | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Public Corporation 1-6 Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Homma, Yoshikazu 4-698, Seki-machi Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Yoshikazu 5-10-1, Kichijojikitamachi Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | [1985/39] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/48] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1985/39] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85103392.8 | 22.03.1985 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | JP19840053462 | 22.03.1984 Original published format: JP 5346284 | JP19840140241 | 06.07.1984 Original published format: JP 14024184 | [1985/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155700 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155700 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155700 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/252, H01J37/18, G01N23/225 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
H01J49/24 (EP,US);
H01J37/252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/39] | Title | German: | Quantitative Sekundärionen-Massenspektrometrie-Gerät | [1985/39] | English: | Apparatus for quantitative secondary ion mass spectrometry | [1990/05] | French: | Appareil de spectrométrie quantitative de masse des ions secondaires | [1985/39] |
Former [1985/39] | Apparatus for quantitive secondary ion mass spectrometry | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/39] | 08.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3798447 (LANUSSE P, et al); | [X]US4179605 (ETOH TERUKAZU [JP], et al) | [X] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MASS SPECTROMETRY AND ION PHYSICS, vol. 7, 1971, pages 111-120, Elsevier Publishing Company, Amsterdam, NL; H.E. BESKE et al.: "A cryopumped ion-bombardment ion source for the trace analysis of solids" | [X] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E, vol. 11, no. 5, May 1978, pages 441-448, The Institute of Physics, London, GB; K. TAKAYANAGI et al.: "Techniques for routine UHV in situ electron microscopy of growth processes of epitaxial thin films" | [XP] - INSTRUMENTS AND EXPERIMENTAL TECHNIQUES, vol. 28, no. 1, part 2, January-February 1985, pages 220-223, Plenum Publishing Corporation, New York, US; A.A. KROSHKOV et al.: "Differential ultrahigh-vacuum pump for electron microscope" | [T] - JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY A, vol. 3, no. 2, March-April 1985, pages 356-360, American Vacuum Society, New York, US; Y. HOMMA et al.: "Analysis of carbon and oxygen in GaAs using a secondary ion mass spectrometer equipped with a 20 K-cryopanel pumping system" |