EP0158859 - Wire cut electrical discharge machine with immobilization of the cut-off portion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A. rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine 8-10 1242 Satigny / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A. rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine 8-10 CH-1242 Satigny / CH | ||
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES SA 109, rue de Lyon CH-1203 Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wavre, Alain 35, Avenue de Budé CH-1202 Genève / CH | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 85103393.6 | 22.03.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | CH19840002017 | 18.04.1984 Original published format: CH 201784 | [1985/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158859 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158859 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158859 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/02 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
B23H7/06 (EP,US);
B23D57/0046 (EP,US);
B23D59/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/43] | Title | German: | Schneiddrahtelektroerosionsmaschine mit Festlegung des abgeschnittenen Teils | [1985/43] | English: | Wire cut electrical discharge machine with immobilization of the cut-off portion | [1985/43] | French: | Machine pour découpage par électroérosion avec immobilisation de la chute | [1985/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 31.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 02.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Request for further processing for: | 10.03.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.1989 | 02.04.1990 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3309624 (CHARMILLES SA ATELIERS [CH]) |