Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] |
18.07.1987 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.09.1987 [1987/36] |
28.05.1986 | First examination report | |
20.09.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.11.1985 [1985/47] |
20.09.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.11.1985 [1985/47] |