Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE29265T | 15.09.1987 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | EP85103548 | 26.03.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3560531D1 | 08.10.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | DE3560531 | 26.03.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU553338B | Global Dossier | 10.07.1986 | B2 | AU4037685 | 03.10.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0161436 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1987 | B1 | EP0161436 | 21.11.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1259997 | 26.09.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CS276976 | 18.11.1992 | B6 | CS231885 | 15.04.1992 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CS276982 | 18.11.1992 | B6 | CS725686 | 15.04.1992 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3411997 | 17.10.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK172240B | 02.02.1998 | B1 | DK142985 | 01.10.1985 | A | DK142985D0 | 29.03.1985 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8607252 | 01.06.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8701733 | 01.01.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU199429 | 28.02.1990 | B | HUT37406 | 28.12.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE58212 | 11.08.1993 | B1 | IE850780L | 30.09.1985 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0643424B | 08.06.1994 | B2 | JPS60224677 | 09.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SU1496644 | 23.07.1989 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4665023 | 12.05.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA852382 | 24.12.1985 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3411997 | 31.03.1984 |