EP0156374 - Process for the preparation of lecithine, by preference the continuous preparation of pure lecithine (oil removed) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lucas Meyer GmbH & Co Ausschläger Elbdeich 62 20539 Hamburg 28 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states Lucas Meyer GmbH & Co Ausschläger Elbdeich 62 D-2000 Hamburg 28 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peter, Siegfried, Prof. Dr. Egerlandstrasse 3 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Weidner, Eckhard, Dipl.-Ing. Egerlandstrasse 3 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Tiegs, Carsten, Dipl.-Ing. Moosäcker 29 D-8501 Eckenhaid / DE | [1989/50] |
Former [1985/43] | 01 /
Peter, Siegfried, Prof. Dr. Egerlandstrasse 3 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | ||
02 /
Weidner, Eckhard, Dipl.-Ing. Egerlandstrasse 3 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | |||
03 /
Tiegs, Carsten, Dipl.-Ing. Moosäcker 29 | |||
Former [1985/40] | 01 /
Peter, Siegfried, Prof. Dr. Egerlandstrasse 3 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | ||
02 /
Weidner, Eckhard, Dipl.-Ing. Egerlandstrasse 3 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1985/40] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85103653.3 | 27.03.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | DE19843411755 | 30.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3411755 | [1985/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0156374 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0156374 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156374 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/10, B01D11/00 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
A23J7/00 (EP);
B01D11/0407 (EP);
C07F9/103 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP);
Y02P20/54 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2300/44 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/40] | C07F9/10 | Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1985/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Lecithin, vorzugsweise zur kontinulierlichen Gewinnung von Rein-Leicithin (entölt) | [1985/40] | English: | Process for the preparation of lecithine, by preference the continuous preparation of pure lecithine (oil removed) | [1985/40] | French: | Procédé de préparation de lécithine, de préférence préparation continue de lécithine pure (déshuilée) | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 30.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.11.1988 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.03.1990 | LU | 31.03.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/24] | BE | 31.03.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3011185 (KALI CHEMIE PHARMA GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2737793 (PETER SIEGFRIED) | [Y] - CHEMIE-INGENIEUR-TECHNIK, Band 53, Nr. 7, 1981, Seiten 529-542, G. BRUNNER et al.: "Zum Stand der Extraktion mit komprimierten Gasen" | Examination | EP0137214 |