EP0159562 - Lifting chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1989 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1989 [1989/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Levo AG Dottikon Bleicheweg 5 5605 Dottikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states Levo AG Dottikon Bleicheweg CH-5605 Dottikon / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Bruno Litzibuchstrasse 14 CH-5610 Wohlen / CH | 02 /
Nold, Peter Glärnischstrasse 8 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Riederer, Conrad A. c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 Postfach 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | Riederer, Conrad A., Dr. Bahnhofstrasse 10 CH-7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 85103664.0 | 27.03.1985 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | CH19840001744 | 06.04.1984 Original published format: CH 174484 | [1985/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0159562 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0159562 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159562 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/00 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
A61G5/14 (EP,US);
A61G5/1054 (EP,US);
A61G5/128 (EP,US);
Y10S297/04 (EP,US);
Y10S297/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/44] | Title | German: | Aufrichtstuhl | [1985/44] | English: | Lifting chair | [1985/44] | French: | Fauteuil élévateur | [1985/44] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/45] | 07.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2433969 (WOOD CHESTER F); | [A]DE2259383 (LAST WERNER); | [AD]DE2362029 (DEUCHER CONRAD R); | [A]GB1407033 (GODFREY ENG LTD, et al); | [A]GB1534777 (IMBRO M); | [E]CH653857 (VALUTEC AG) | by applicant | DE2362029 | GB1534777 |