blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0158895

EP0158895 - Method of making refractory bricks or other shaped products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.02.1988
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HÜLS TROISDORF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 11 65
D-53839 Troisdorf / DE
[1991/11]
Former [1985/43]For all designated states
Hüls Troisdorf Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 11 65
D-5210 Troisdorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Flessner, Gerd
Heinrich v. Kleist-Strasse 8
D-5450 Neuwied-12 / DE
02 / Spiess, Gerhart, Dr.
Beethovenstrasse 36
D-5410 Höhr-Grenzhausen / DE
03 / Weissenfels, Franz, Dr.
Am Grafenkreuz 17
D-5200 Siegburg / DE
[1985/43]
Application number, filing date85103760.628.03.1985
[1985/43]
Priority number, dateDE1984341415314.04.1984         Original published format: DE 3414153
[1985/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0158895
Date:23.10.1985
Language:DE
[1985/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0158895
Date:30.09.1987
Language:DE
[1987/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.1987
ClassificationIPC:C04B35/00
[1985/43]
CPC:
C04B35/63472 (EP); C04B26/122 (EP); C04B35/013 (EP);
C04B35/101 (EP); C04B35/18 (EP); C04B35/634 (EP);
C04B35/63476 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung feuerfester Steine oder anderer Formkörper[1985/43]
English:Method of making refractory bricks or other shaped products[1985/43]
French:Procédé de fabrication de briques réfractaires ou d'autres produits formés[1985/43]
File destroyed:10.08.1994
Examination procedure03.04.1987Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/12]
28.10.1987Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1988/12]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.198703   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0075279  ;
 [X]US4348343  ;
 [X]US4210453  ;
 [YD]DE2822653  ;
 [A]EP0087825  ;
 [A]US4216020
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.