EP0156398 - FSK or FM burst signal generating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohta, Kiyoshi c/o NEC Corporatio 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85103848.9 | 29.03.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | JP19840062805 | 30.03.1984 Original published format: JP 6280584 | JP19840073811 | 12.04.1984 Original published format: JP 7381184 | JP19850021445 | 06.02.1985 Original published format: JP 2144585 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0156398 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0156398 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156398 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/10, H04B7/212 | [1993/06] | CPC: |
H03G3/3047 (EP,US);
H03D1/10 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (US)
|
Former IPC [1985/40] | H04J3/10, H04B7/185 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/40] | Title | German: | Frequenz- oder frequenzumtastungsmodulierter Burstsignalgenerator | [1985/40] | English: | FSK or FM burst signal generating apparatus | [1985/40] | French: | Générateur de signaux en rafales modulés en fréquence ou par déplacement de fréquence | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 21.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5814633 ; | [A]EP0075601 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0066839 (NEC CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 88 (E-170)[1233], 12th April 1983; & JP-A-58 14 633 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 27-01-1983, & JP5814633 A 00000000 |