EP0158258 - Impact-resistant resinous compositions and method of making [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hobbs, Stanley Young 33 Gould Drive Schenectady New York 12302 / US | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet 92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1988/03] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1985/42] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 85103922.2 | 01.04.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | US19840597321 | 06.04.1984 Original published format: US 597321 | [1985/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158258 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158258 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08L51/04 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
C08L51/003 (EP);
C08L51/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/003, C08L2666/24 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/24 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/42] | Title | German: | Schlagzähe Harzzusammensetzungen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1985/42] | English: | Impact-resistant resinous compositions and method of making | [1985/42] | French: | Compositions résineuses résistantes au choc et leur méthode de fabrication | [1985/42] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 21.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 29.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/28] | 15.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2603289 ; | [A]GB1182943 ; | [A]US4146589 ; | [A]FR2162154 ; | [A]DE1900134 ; | [A]DE3118629 ; | [A]DE2620579 ; | [A]EP0048389 ; | [A]US4214056 |