Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] |
02.08.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] |
18.07.1989 | First examination report | |
11.03.1988 | Change - representative | published on 27.04.1988 [1988/17] |
24.08.1987 | Publication of search report | published on 14.10.1987 [1987/42] |
09.11.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.01.1986 [1986/02] |
09.11.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.01.1986 [1986/02] |