EP0166878 - Blood testing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORPORATION P.O. Box 5 05 28 Indianapolis Indiana 46250 / US | [1986/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herstein, Bernard 9106 Western Drive Houston Texas 77080 / US | 02 /
Hoselton, Rick Foster 7714 Kellwood Houston Texas 77040 / US | 03 /
Buck, Herry Merrick 10910 Hazen Houston Texas 77072 / US | 04 /
Lape, Larry J. 502 Rozelle Sugarland Texas 77478 / US | [1986/02] | Representative(s) | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte Pfeiffer & Jany Beiertheimer Allee 19 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Moser und Dr. Pfeifer Nowackanlage 15 D-76137 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1986/02] | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter Boehringer Mannheim GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104103.8 | 04.04.1985 | [1986/02] | Priority number, date | US19840597512 | 06.04.1984 Original published format: US 597512 | US19840597513 | 06.04.1984 Original published format: US 597513 | [1986/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0166878 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0166878 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0166878 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/14, G01N21/47 | [1986/02] | CPC: |
G01N21/4738 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150068 (EP,US);
A61B5/150183 (EP,US);
A61B5/150305 (EP,US);
A61B5/150343 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150755 (EP,US);
A61B5/150809 (EP,US);
A61B5/15105 (EP,US);
A61B5/15186 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/7405 (EP,US);
G01N2021/478 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/02] | Title | German: | Bluttestapparat | [1986/02] | English: | Blood testing apparatus | [1986/02] | French: | Appareil pour faire un test sanguin | [1986/02] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 21.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37] | Request for further processing for: | 23.04.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2047706 (SYSTEMATICS); | [A]US3933439 (MCDONALD BERNARD); | [A]US4210026 (AMOS LYNN G [US], et al); | [A]FR2508305 (SLAMA GERARD [FR]); | [A]EP0097748 (SLAMA GERARD JOSEPH) | [A] - ENGINEERING, vol. 220, no. 4, April 1980, page 406 |