EP0158289 - Apparatus for the ultrasonic testing of electrically conducting objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/42] | Method and apparatus for the ultrasonic testing of electrically conducting objects | ||
[1990/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nukem GmbH Rodenbacher Chaussee 6 Postfach 11 00 80 D-63434 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states Nukem GmbH Rodenbacher Chaussee 6 Postfach 11 00 80 D-63434 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hüschelrath, Gerhard, Dr. Beethovenstrasse 6 D-8752 Laufach / DE | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Salzstrasse 11 a Postfach 21 44 D-63411 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1990/17] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Salzstrasse 11a D-63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1985/42] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Strasse & Stoffregen Salzstrasse 11a Postfach 2144 D-63411 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104112.9 | 09.04.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | DE19843413787 | 12.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3413787 | [1985/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158289 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158289 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158289 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
G01N29/2412 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02854 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0422 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0423 (EP,US);
G01N2291/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Prüfung von elektrisch leitenden Gegenständen mittels Ultraschall | [1990/28] | English: | Apparatus for the ultrasonic testing of electrically conducting objects | [1990/28] | French: | Appareil pour le contrôle ultrasonore d'objets électriquement conducteurs | [1990/28] |
Former [1985/42] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Prüfung von elektrisch leitenden Gegenständen mittels Ultraschall | ||
Former [1985/42] | Method and apparatus for the ultrasonic testing of electrically conducting objects | ||
Former [1985/42] | Procédé et appareil pour le contrôle ultrasonore d'objets électriquement conducteurs | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 02.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 01.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/27] | Request for further processing for: | 04.08.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 04.08.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.07.1990 | GB | 11.07.1990 | IT | 11.07.1990 | NL | 11.07.1990 | SE | 11.07.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 11.07.1990 | |
IT | 11.07.1990 | ||
NL | 11.07.1990 | ||
SE | 11.07.1990 | ||
FR | 07.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/40] | GB | 11.07.1990 | |
NL | 11.07.1990 | ||
SE | 11.07.1990 | ||
FR | 07.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | GB | 11.07.1990 | |
NL | 11.07.1990 | ||
SE | 11.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/30] | GB | 11.07.1990 | |
SE | 11.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | SE | 11.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5888653 ; | [A]US3555887 (WOOD FENTON M); | [A]EP0024707 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0051758 (NUKEM GMBH [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 188 (P-217)[1333], 17. August 1983; & JP-A-58 88 653 (NIPPON KOKAN K.K.) 26-05-1983, & JP5888653 A 00000000 |