EP0162268 - Position/speed detection method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/48] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watabe, Mitsuru 1-19-5-302, Ishinazakacho Hitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Morinaga, Shigeki 2-10-12, Hanayamacho Hitachi-shi / JP | 03 /
Sugiura, Yasuyuki 2565-16, Oaza Ishitaki Takahagi-shi / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Tadashi 1415-7, Ishinazakacho Hitachi-shi / JP | [1985/48] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/48] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104395.0 | 11.04.1985 | [1985/48] | Priority number, date | JP19840071865 | 12.04.1984 Original published format: JP 7186584 | [1985/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0162268 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162268 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/489 | [1985/48] | CPC: |
G01P3/489 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Stellungs-/Geschwindigkeitsermittlung | [1985/48] | English: | Position/speed detection method and apparatus | [1985/48] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection de la position/vitesse | [1985/48] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/07] | 13.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0059244 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0059433 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3234575 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | EP0145935 |