EP0163083 - Injection molding peripheral opening core ring gate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLD-MASTERS LIMITED 233 Armstrong Avenue Georgetown Ontario L7G 4X5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states MOLD-MASTERS LIMITED 233 Armstrong Avenue Georgetown Ontario L7G 4X5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rose, Thomas J. 3886 Leewood Drive Stow Ohio / US | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104440.4 | 12.04.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | US19840614854 | 29.05.1984 Original published format: US 614854 | [1985/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163083 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0163083 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163083 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/28 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
B29C45/2896 (EP,US);
B29L2015/003 (EP,US);
Y10S425/224 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/49] | Title | German: | Sich am Umfang öffnende Kernringdüsenöffnung zum Spritzgiessen | [1985/49] | English: | Injection molding peripheral opening core ring gate | [1985/49] | French: | Orifice d'injection annulaire à noyau à ouverture périphérique pour le moulage par injection | [1985/49] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 18.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 08.05.1991 | [1991/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP55061438 ; | [A]JP58005238 ; | [AD]US4043740 (GELLERT JOBST ULRICH); | [A]FR1605509 ; | [A]EP0075043 (DISCOVISION ASS [US]); | [A]US4416608 (DEARDURFF LAWRENCE R [US]); | [A]EP0099088 (GELLERT JOBST U); | [A]EP0106980 (GELLERT JOBST U); | [AP]EP0117510 (GELLERT JOBST U) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 102 (M-22)[584], 22nd July 1980; & JP-A-55 061 438 (HOUKOKU JIYUSHI KOGYO K.K.) 09-05-1980, & JP55061438 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 79 (M-204)[1224], 31st March 1983; & JP-A-58 005 238 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO K.K.) 12-01-1983, & JP58005238 A 00000000 |