EP0158992 - Blank with an internal bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REUTHER VERPACKUNG GMBH Elisabethstrasse 6 56564 Neuwied / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states REUTHER VERPACKUNG GMBH Elisabethstrasse 6 D-5450 Neuwied 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reuther, Waldemar, Dr. Elisabethstrasse 6 D-5450 Neuwied 1 / DE | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Säger, Manfred Säger & Hofmann Patent AG Feldgüetliweg 130 8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Säger, Manfred Säger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei (GbR) Römersteig 2 Postfach 5 7304 Maienfeld / CH | ||
Former [1989/49] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Säger & Partner Postfach 81 08 09 D-81908 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/35] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Säger & Partner Postfach 81 08 09 D-81908 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/43] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser, Flügel & Säger Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 56 Postfach 81 05 40 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104479.2 | 12.04.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | DE19840011704U | 13.04.1984 Original published format: DE 8411704 U | [1985/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158992 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158992 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/60 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
B65D5/606 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1986/05] |
Former [1985/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Faltschachtel mit eingesetztem inneren Beutel | [1985/43] | English: | Blank with an internal bag | [1985/43] | French: | Flan à sac interne | [1985/43] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1995 | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1985 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, IT, LU, SE | 21.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/03] | 28.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.05.1985 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1985 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1985 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1985 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1985 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2250249 ; | [Y]NL51588C ; | [A]US2866584 |